Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2752584

EP2752584 - LINK MECHANISM, AND VARIABLE STATIONARY-BLADE DRIVING DEVICE PROVIDED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd.
3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Yokohama 220-8401 / JP
[2015/16]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd.
3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome, Nishi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku
TOKYO, Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO Shinya
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
02 / KAMEDA Takuro
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[2014/28]
Application number, filing date12846240.530.07.2012
[2016/26]
WO2012JP69329
Priority number, dateJP2011024214304.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011242143
[2014/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013065368
Date:10.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2752584
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2752584
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/56, F04D29/64, // F16D1/06, F16H21/12
[2015/15]
Former International [2014/28]F04D29/56, F04D29/64, F16B5/02, F16D1/06, F16H21/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSMECHANISMUS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VARIABLE ANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT STATIONÄRER SCHAUFEL[2016/07]
English:LINK MECHANISM, AND VARIABLE STATIONARY-BLADE DRIVING DEVICE PROVIDED THEREWITH[2014/28]
French:MÉCANISME DE LIAISON, ET DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À AUBE VARIABLE DE STATOR ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI[2014/28]
Former [2014/28]VERBINDUNGSMECHANISMUS UND VARIABLE ANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT STATIONÄRER SCHAUFEL DAMIT
Entry into regional phase12.02.2014Translation filed 
12.02.2014National basic fee paid 
12.02.2014Search fee paid 
12.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
18.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2016Fee for grant paid
04.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Opposition(s)30.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2012
AL29.06.2016
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CY29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MK29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
TR29.06.2016
IE30.07.2016
LU30.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR29.08.2016
BG29.09.2016
GB29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU30.07.2012
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CY29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MK29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
TR29.06.2016
IE30.07.2016
LU30.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR29.08.2016
BG29.09.2016
GB29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU30.07.2012
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CY29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MK29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
IE30.07.2016
LU30.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR29.08.2016
BG29.09.2016
GB29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU30.07.2012
AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CY29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MK29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
IE30.07.2016
LU30.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR29.08.2016
BG29.09.2016
GB29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
IE30.07.2016
LU30.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR29.08.2016
BG29.09.2016
GB29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/25]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
DK29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/19]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT29.06.2016
BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2017/03]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2011211941  (HIROKAWA KAZUHARU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0060] - [0067] * * figures 1,4-6 *;
 [A]EP0545656  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 2,6 *;
 [A]GB2402179  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 26 * * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 8 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5593275  (VENKATASUBBU SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * figures 2,3 *
International search[A]JP2010196550  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [A]JP2000320498  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND);
 [A]JPH0462399U  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPH0612838U  (MEIDENSHA CORP.);
 [A]JPH11138312  (RICOH KK)
by applicantJP2010196550