Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2773911 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2773911



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 406
24.09.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
09.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
14.03.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
07.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
07.03.2018 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 1
07.03.2018 Description Search / examination 4
07.03.2018 Drawings Search / examination 1
07.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.03.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.11.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
14.11.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
03.08.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 11
03.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
03.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Description Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
18.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
09.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2016 Description Search / examination 5
09.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.11.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
06.10.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 19
14.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 19
14.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
14.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
17.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
02.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
13.05.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 22
13.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
14.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.10.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
10.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27