Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776872

EP2776872 - EXPLORATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTION OF HYDROCARBONS WITH AN UNDERWATER VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company
22777 Springwoods Village Parkway
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2015/50]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Exxonmobil Upstream Research Company
3120 Buffalo Speedway
Houston, TX 77098-2189 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POTTORF, Robert, J.
1455 Springrock Lane
Houston, TX 77055 / US
02 / LAWSON, Michael
1000A Columbus St.
Houston, TX 77019 / US
03 / MAY, Steven, R.
2907 Four Winds Dr.
Missouri City, TX 77459 / US
04 / DREYFUS, Sebastien, L.
1029 Arlington St.
Houston, TX 77008 / US
05 / RAMAN, Sumathy
22 Forsgate Terrace
Annandale, NJ 08801 / US
06 / BOND, William
3227 Vista Lake Drive
Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US
07 / SRNKA, Leonard, J.
5021 Pocahontas St.
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
08 / MEURER, William, P.
2401 Bay Spring Street
Pearland, TX 77584 / US
09 / POWELL, William, G.
3120 Buffalo Speedway
Houston, TX 77098 / US
10 / RUDOLPH, Kurt, W.
6810 Asmore Drive
Houston, TX 77069 / US
11 / VANDEWATER, Christopher, J.
1124 Rutland Street
Houston, TX 77008 / US
12 / CHERNEY, Daniel
51 Country Acres Dr.
Hampton, NJ 08827 / US
13 / ERTAS, Mehmet, D.
4145 Klein Street
Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US
14 / ROBINSON, Amelia, C.
4309 Greeley Street
Houston, TX 77006 / US
15 / REGBERG, Aaron, B.
1812 Stanford St., Apt. 1
Houston, TX 77006 / US
16 / N'GUESSAN, Lucie, A.
1729 Wrenwood Lakes
Houston, TX 770043 / US
 [2014/42]
Former [2014/38]01 / POTTORF, Robert, J.
1455 Springrock Lane
Houston, TX 77055 / US
02 / LAWSON, Michael
1000A Columbus St.
Houston, TX 77019 / US
03 / MAY, Steven, R.
2907 Four Winds Dr.
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
04 / DREYFUS, Sebastien, L.
1029 Arlington St.
Houston, TX 77008 / US
05 / RAMAN, Sumathy
22 Forsgate Terrace
Annandale, NJ 08801 / US
06 / BOND, William
3227 Vista Lake Drive
Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US
07 / SRNKA, Leonard, J.
5021 Pocahontas St.
Bellaire, TX 77401 / US
08 / MEURER, William, P.
2401 Bay Spring Street
Pearland, TX 77584 / US
09 / POWELL, William, G.
3120 Buffalo Speedway
Houston, TX 77098 / US
10 / RUDOLPH, Kurt, W.
6810 Asmore Drive
Houston, TX 77069 / US
11 / VANDEWATER, Christopher, J.
1124 Rutland Street
Houston, TX 77008 / US
12 / CHERNEY, Daniel
51 Country Acres Dr.
Hampton, NJ 08827 / US
13 / ERTAS, Mehmet, D.
4145 Klein Street
Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US
14 / ROBINSON, Amelia, C.
4309 Greeley Street
Houston, TX 77006 / US
15 / REGBERG, Aaron, B.
1812 Stanford St., Apt. 1
Houston, TX 77006 / US
16 / N'GUESSAN, Lucie, A.
12888 Queensbury Lane W519
Houston, TX 77024 / US
Representative(s)ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Troch, Geneviève , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date12847005.109.11.2012
WO2012US64549
Priority number, dateUS201161558822P11.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161558822 P
US201261595394P06.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595394 P
US201261616813P28.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261616813 P
WO2012US5254227.08.2012         Original published format: PCT/US2012/052542
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013071186
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2776872
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01V9/00, G01N33/24, // G01V5/00, B63G8/00, G01V11/00
[2019/31]
Former International [2015/31]G01V11/00, G01N1/00, G01N29/14, G01V3/08, G01N33/24, G01V9/00, // G01V5/00, G01V8/00, G01V8/02, G06F19/00
Former International [2014/38]G01V11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:ERKUNDUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN MIT EINEM UNTERWASSERFAHRZEUG[2014/38]
English:EXPLORATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTION OF HYDROCARBONS WITH AN UNDERWATER VEHICLE[2014/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLORATION ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTECTION D'HYDROCARBURES AVEC UN VÉHICULE SOUS-MARIN (UV)[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2014National basic fee paid 
06.06.2014Search fee paid 
06.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011205536  (JOHNSEN GEIR [NO]) [X] 1,3,9-11,17 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 31] - [0038] - [0 48] , [0 76]; figure 2 * [I] 4,5,12,13;
 [YA]US4560664  (DEMAISON GERARD J [US], et al) [Y] 8,16 * column 1, paragraphs 20-25 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 11 * * figure 2; tables 1-2 * [A] 7;
 [Y]US2002171427  (WIEGERT ROY F [US], et al) [Y] 6,14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0 16] *;
 [Y]US2003167998  (HUNTSMAN DWIGHT DAVID [US]) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0038] *;
 [XYI]  - CAMILLI R ET AL, "Integrating in-situ chemical sampling with auv control systems", OCEANS '04. MTTS/IEEE TECHNO-OCEAN '04 KOBE, JAPAN NOV. 9-12, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041109), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/OCEANS.2004.1402902, ISBN 978-0-7803-8669-3, pages 101 - 109, XP010775989 [X] 1-3,9-11,17,18 * page 101, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 102, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 102, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 105, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 106, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 6,8,14,16,19 [I] 4,5,12,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/OCEANS.2004.1402902
 [XI]  - FRIES D ET AL, "Solar robotic material sampler system for chemical, biological and physical ocean observations", OCEANS 2011, IEEE, (20110919), ISBN 978-1-4577-1427-6, pages 1 - 5, XP032075878 [X] 1,7,9,10,15,17 * page 1, column 2, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1 * * page 3, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 4, column 1, paragraph 2 * [I] 5,13
 [A]  - TEDETTI M ET AL, "Utilization of a submersible UV fluorometer for monitoring anthropogenic inputs in the Mediterranean coastal waters", MARINE POLLUTION BULLETIN, OXFORD, GB, vol. 60, no. 3, ISSN 0025-326X, (20100301), pages 350 - 362, (20091130), XP026954321 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 350, columns 1-2 * * page 361, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 354, column 1, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - CAMILLI R ET AL, "Method for rapid localization of seafloor petroleum contamination using concurrent mass spectrometry and acoustic positioning", MARINE POLLUTION BULLETIN, OXFORD, GB, vol. 58, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.MARPOLBUL.2009.05.016, ISSN 0025-326X, (20091001), pages 1505 - 1513, (20090621), XP026644134 [A] 1-19 * page 1506, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 1513, column 1, paragraphs 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.marpolbul.2009.05.016
International search[Y]US2009189074  (BELLO JOB M [US]);
 [Y]US4560664  (DEMAISON GERARD J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008136420  (VELIKHOV EVGENY P [RU], et al);
 [Y]US2011205536  (JOHNSEN GEIR [NO]);
 [Y]US2010012336  (ADAMSON JAMES E [US]);
 [Y]US2010015612  (PELHAM SARAH [GB], et al);
 [Y]US3961187  (BARRINGER ANTHONY RENE);
 [Y]US2005036404  (ZHU WEIQING [CN], et al)