Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779766

EP2779766 - TERMINAL, BASE STATION, COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AND COMMUNICATIONS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOGAMI, Toshizo
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / SHIMEZAWA, Kazuyuki
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / IMAMURA, Kimihiko
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
04 / NAKASHIMA, Daiichiro
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12847127.302.11.2012
WO2012JP78416
Priority number, dateJP2011024296407.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011242964
[2014/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013069550
Date:16.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779766
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/38]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:ENDGERÄT, BASISSTATION, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2014/38]
English:TERMINAL, BASE STATION, COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AND COMMUNICATIONS METHOD[2014/38]
French:TERMINAL, STATION DE BASE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2014Translation filed 
07.05.2014National basic fee paid 
07.05.2014Search fee paid 
07.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
04.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010165847  (KAMUF MATTHIAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 8,9 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0060]; figures 11-14 *;
 [X]  - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on ePDCCH Design Issues", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112517 EPDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110816), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20110822, XP050537597 [X] 1-12 * Section 2;; figures 1, 2 *
 [I]  - PANASONIC, "R-PDCCH placement", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102042, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100406), vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050419373 [I] 1-12 * Section 2;; figures 3-5 *
 [I]  - ZTE, "The mapping schemes of R-PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102915 R-PDCCH MAPPING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420046 [I] 1-12 * Section 2 *
 [A]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "E-PDCCH design aspects", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113174, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538301 [A] 1-12 * Section 2 *
International search[X]WO2010076300  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al);
 [Y]  - LG-ERICSSON, "Consideration on E-PDCCH multiplexing and signalling", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #66BIS R1-113372, ZHUHAI, CHINA, (20011010), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/ WG1 RL1/TSGR1 66b/Docs/R1-113372.zip, (20121120), XP050538429