blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2779766


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.07.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.03.2017 First examination report
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.06.2015 Change - classification published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
05.06.2015 Change - classification published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
05.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
09.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.02.2015  [2015/07]
17.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication