blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2779766 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280054513 EP12847127



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9398580Global Dossier 19.07.2016B2
US2014348095 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP78416 02.11.2012
JP2011242964 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103918331BGlobal Dossier 14.09.2018B
CN103918331 09.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012JP78416 02.11.2012
JP2011242964 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2779766Global Dossier 08.07.2015A4
EP2779766 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP78416 02.11.2012
JP2011242964 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013069550Global Dossier 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011242964 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5994967BGlobal Dossier 21.09.2016B2
JP2013098945 20.05.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2011242964 07.11.2011