EP2777003 - ADVERTISING OFFERS USING SOCIAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMAN, Michael 1579 Oriole Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12847182.8 | 14.09.2012 | WO2012US55573 | Priority number, date | US201113290723 | 07.11.2011 Original published format: US201113290723 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013070318 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777003 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q50/30 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
G06Q30/02 (KR);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | BEWERBEN VON ANGEBOTEN ANHAND SOZIALER NETZWERKE | [2014/38] | English: | ADVERTISING OFFERS USING SOCIAL NETWORKS | [2014/38] | French: | OFFRES PUBLICITAIRES UTILISANT LES RÉSEAUX SOCIAUX | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 11.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2009192881 (PIERRE JOSEPH R [US]); | [Y]US2009222348 (RANSOM VICTORIA [US], et al); | [Y]US2009319359 (SOZA HARRY RAYMOND [US], et al); | [A]KR20110032878 (KIM SEOK KI [KR]); | [A]KR101069205B (MORIAHTOWN CO LTD [KR]) |