blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2778013


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
28.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
20.05.2016 (Expected) grant published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
18.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.03.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.03.2016 Change - classification published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
04.03.2016 Change - classification published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
23.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
21.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
16.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
04.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2013 Amendment by applicant
22.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication