blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2778013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9272720Global Dossier 01.03.2016B2
US2014316619 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011247486 11.11.2011
WO2012JP79135 09.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPWO2013069772Global Dossier 02.04.2015A1
JP5661196B 28.01.2015B2
Priority number Date
JP2013543045 09.11.2012
JP2011247486 11.11.2011
WO2012JP79135 09.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2778013Global Dossier 22.06.2016B1
EP2778013 23.09.2015A4
EP2778013 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011247486 11.11.2011
WO2012JP79135 09.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013069772Global Dossier 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011247486 11.11.2011