Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778013

EP2778013 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2016/25]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KIKUCHI, Daisuke
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1006150 / JP
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/25]
Former [2014/38]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12847417.809.11.2012
[2016/25]
WO2012JP79135
Priority number, dateJP2011024748611.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011247486
[2014/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013069772
Date:16.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2778013
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2778013
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/36, B61L25/04, G01C21/00, B61L15/00, B61L27/00
[2016/14]
Former International [2015/39]B61L25/04, G01C21/00, B61L15/00, B61L27/00
Former International [2014/38]B61L25/04, G01C21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/38]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM[2014/38]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2013Translation filed 
21.11.2013National basic fee paid 
21.11.2013Search fee paid 
21.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/38]
05.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2016Fee for grant paid
11.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Opposition(s)23.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.11.2012
AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
MT09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU09.11.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
MT09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU09.11.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
MT09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU09.11.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU09.11.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/50]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/38]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]SG173871  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0111] * [I] 4,10;
 [X]US2008140287  (YANG MAN SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2006041374  (INOUE YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2006273216  (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST, et al) [A] 4 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2010069910  (ZENRIN DATACOM CO LTD, et al);
 [A]JP2011197746  (NAVITIME JAPAN CO LTD);
 [A]JP2010116102  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al);
 [A]JP2009067252  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
by applicantJP2009104319