Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776210

EP2776210 - COMPOSITE ABRASIVE WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2017/03]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VAN, Loc X.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / NGUYEN, Thu A.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/03]
Former [2014/38]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12847458.206.11.2012
[2017/03]
WO2012US63662
Priority number, dateUS201161557563P09.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161557563 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013070576
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2776210
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2776210
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:B24D5/14, B24D3/20, B24D5/12
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/38]B24D3/20, B24D3/34, B24D9/00, B24D7/00, C09K3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENGESETZTE SCHLEIFSCHEIBE[2014/38]
English:COMPOSITE ABRASIVE WHEEL[2014/38]
French:ROUE DE PONÇAGE COMPOSITE[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2014National basic fee paid 
05.05.2014Search fee paid 
05.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
18.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2016Fee for grant paid
08.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
[2018/33]
Former [2018/14]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/41]ES18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2004306172  (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0015] - [0018]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2011109188  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPH0890423  (NORITAKE CO LTD);
 [Y]WO2011109188  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al);
 [A]US5876470  (ABRAHAMSON GERALD R [US]);
 [A]US5725421  (GOERS BRIAN D [US], et al);
 [A]US4867758  (NEWKIRK MARC S [US])