Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775840

EP2775840 - METHODS OF TREATING SCHIZOPHRENIA WITH PHENYLALANINE ENAMIDE DERIVATIVE INHIBITORS OF 4 INTEGRIN POSSESSING A CYCLOBUTENE GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aestus Therapeutics, Inc.
104 Windsor Center Drive
East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HONORE, Tage
539 Princeton-Kingston Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / PRYSAK, Meredith H.
21 11th Avenue
Monroe Township, NJ 08831 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12848127.208.11.2012
WO2012US64054
Priority number, dateUS201161557631P09.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161557631 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013070842
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775840
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/4375
[2015/24]
Former International [2014/38]A01N43/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHIZOPHRENIE MIT PHENYLALANIN-ENAMID-DERIVAT-HEMMERN AUS 4 INTEGRIN MIT EINER CYCLOBUTENGRUPPE[2014/38]
English:METHODS OF TREATING SCHIZOPHRENIA WITH PHENYLALANINE ENAMIDE DERIVATIVE INHIBITORS OF 4 INTEGRIN POSSESSING A CYCLOBUTENE GROUP[2014/38]
French:MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCHIZOPHRÉNIE AVEC DES INHIBITEURS DE L'INTÉGRINE 4 DÉRIVÉS DE PHÉNYLALANINE-ÉNAMIDE POSSÉDANT UN GROUPE CYCLOBUTÈNE[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2014National basic fee paid 
19.05.2014Search fee paid 
19.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
09.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/27]
18.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]WO02068393
 [Y]WO0212339
 [Y]US7786177
 [Y]US7645770
 [Y]  YOU ET AL., "A 3D structure model of integrin alpha 4 beta 1 complex: I. Construction of a homology model of beta 1 and ligand binding analysis", BIOPHYS J, (2002), vol. 82, PAGE 447 - 457, XP055136373 [Y]