blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2775840 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2775840



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 174
08.06.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
11.01.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
11.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
09.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
09.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
19.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
21.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56
16.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 48