blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2775840
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014357654Global Dossier 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US64054 08.11.2012
US201214356398 08.11.2012
US201161557631 09.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2775840Global Dossier 10.06.2015A4
EP2775840 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US64054 08.11.2012
US201161557631 09.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2854658 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US64054 08.11.2012
US201161557631 09.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013070842Global Dossier 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161557631 09.11.2011