Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779432

EP2779432 - LINEAR CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.01.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAGI, Katsuyuki
c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2016/24]
Former [2014/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date12848407.809.10.2012
[2016/24]
WO2012JP06461
Priority number, dateJP2011024356107.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011243561
[2014/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013069203
Date:16.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779432
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2779432
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02P25/06, B65G43/00, B65G54/02, H02K41/03, H02P29/02, B65G25/04, H02K11/00
[2015/25]
Former International [2014/38]H02P25/06, B65G43/00, B65G54/02, H02K41/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LINEARFÖRDERER[2014/38]
English:LINEAR CONVEYOR[2014/38]
French:TRANSPORTEUR LINÉAIRE[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014Translation filed 
05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Search fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
22.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.05.2016Fee for grant paid
04.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.03.2017  20.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
FESTO AG & Co. KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
 [2017/17]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.04.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.08.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.01.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition11.03.2019Appeal received No.  T0728/19
13.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.10.2012
AL15.06.2016
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
TR15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU09.10.2012
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
TR15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU09.10.2012
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
BG15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/31]HU09.10.2012
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU09.10.2012
AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CY15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
MC15.06.2016
MK15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IE09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/42]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
LU09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/38]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
DK15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SI15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
GB09.10.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT15.06.2016
BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
ES15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
SM15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
PT17.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE15.06.2016
CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
PL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
SK15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
IS15.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ15.06.2016
EE15.06.2016
FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
IT15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RO15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
NL15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
SE15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
GR16.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI15.06.2016
HR15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
LV15.06.2016
RS15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI15.06.2016
LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT15.06.2016
NO15.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6191507  (PELTIER KENNETH [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004262401  (KILIBARDA VELIBOR [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5984498  (LEM HANS J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4853602  (HOMMES WILLIAM J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4675582  (HOMMES WILLIAM J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2003244929  (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2009187239  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD.);
 [A]JP2004250180  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.);
 [A]JP2010130740  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011101552  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2011098786
OppositionUS6191507
 US2004262401
 US5984498
 US4853602
 US4675582
 JP2003244929
 JP2009187239
 JP2011101552
 JP2004250180
 JP2010130740
 EP2088026
 EP1736675
 EP1555186
 US27615
 JPH1160156
    - JOHN R. TUTTLE, "Traditional and emerging technologies and applications in the radio frequency identification (RFID) industry", IEEE Radio Frequency integrated Circuit Symposium, Denver, Co, (19970610), pages 5 - 8, XP032380634

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RFIC.1997.598729