blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2776938


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.06.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
15.02.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
16.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
15.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication