blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2776938 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280055490 EP12848540



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104067256Global Dossier 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US45636 06.07.2012
US201113294236 11.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2776938Global Dossier 15.07.2015A4
EP2776938 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US45636 06.07.2012
US201113294236 11.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014011282 02.05.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2012US45636 06.07.2012
US201113294236 11.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013070284Global Dossier 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113294236 11.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9634863Global Dossier 25.04.2017B2
US2013121346 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113294236 11.11.2011