EP2776938 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SUPPORTING TWO DIFFERENT PROTOCOLS ON A SAME PHYSICAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLLMORGEN CORPORATION 201 West Rock Road Radford, VA 24141 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Judy, Anne 425 Cannon Green Drive Apt. B Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 02 /
PEARCE, Robert 27 Belvoir Road Bristol BS6 5DQ / GB | 03 /
CLINE, David 5225 Toluca Court Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | 04 /
YUNDT, George, B. 5 Whittemore Terrace Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 12848540.6 | 06.07.2012 | WO2012US45636 | Priority number, date | US201113294236 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: US201113294236 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013070284 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776938 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/06 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L69/163 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/38] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ZWEI VERSCHIEDENEN PROTOKOLLEN AUF DERSELBEN PHYSIKALISCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2014/38] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SUPPORTING TWO DIFFERENT PROTOCOLS ON A SAME PHYSICAL CONNECTION | [2014/38] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE DEUX PROTOCOLES DIFFÉRENTS SUR UNE MÊME CONNEXION PHYSIQUE | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 12.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003023795 (PACKWOOD STEVE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0022] - [0038] - [0047] *; | [A] - KNEZIC M ET AL, "Topology aspects in EtherCAT networks", POWER ELECTRONICS AND MOTION CONTROL CONFERENCE (EPE/PEMC), 2010 14TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100906), ISBN 978-1-4244-7856-9, pages T1 - 1, XP031778431 [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0III] * | International search | [Y]US2010329247 (KENNEDY ET AL.); | [Y]US2005078683 (PAGE); | [Y]US2004138786 (BLACKETT ET AL.); | [A]US2005105534 (OSTERLING) |