blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2780463


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.11.2015 Withdrawal of application published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
29.05.2015 Change - classification published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Change - classification published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
23.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
12.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication