blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2780463
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014302028Global Dossier 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201214357779 14.11.2012
WO2012US64972 14.11.2012
US201161561412 18.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2780463Global Dossier 01.07.2015A4
EP2780463 24.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US64972 14.11.2012
US201161561412 18.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013074598Global Dossier 23.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161561412 18.11.2011