Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2780463

EP2780463 - Fc CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES HAVING INCREASED ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PROPERTIES AND INCREASED FcRN BINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.12.2015  [2015/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHA, Dongxing
21 Lafayette Street
Suite 200
Lebanon, New Hampshire 03766 / US
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Böhles, Elena
Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12849080.214.11.2012
WO2012US64972
Priority number, dateUS201161561412P18.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161561412 P
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013074598
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2780463
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/08, C07K16/00
[2015/27]
Former International [2014/39]C12P21/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:FC ENTHALTENDE POLYPEPTIDE MIT ERHÖHTEN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND ERHÖHTER FCRN-BINDUNG[2014/39]
English:Fc CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES HAVING INCREASED ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PROPERTIES AND INCREASED FcRN BINDING[2014/39]
French:POLYPEPTIDES CONTENANT FC AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES AMÉLIORÉES ET UNE LIAISON AMÉLIORÉE À FCRN[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
04.11.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]  DIMITROV J D ET AL, "Sialylated therapeutic IgG: a sweet remedy for inflammatory diseases?", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB; BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1093/NDT/GFL847, ISSN 0931-0509, (20070501), pages 1301 - 1304, (20070213), XP002722277 [I] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular the section 'perspectives' *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/gfl847
 [I]  WEIKERT S ET AL, "Engineering Chinese hamster ovary cells to maximize sialic acid content of recombinant glycoproteins", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (19991101), vol. 17, no. 11, doi:10.1038/15104, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1116 - 1121, XP002203703 [I] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular the abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/15104
 [I]  ROBERT M ANTHONY ET AL, "A Novel Role for the IgG Fc Glycan: The Anti-inflammatory Activity of Sialylated IgG Fcs", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20100518), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 1573-2592, pages 9 - 14, XP019822478 [I] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular Fig.2 *
 [I]  R. DENG ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics of Humanized Monoclonal Anti-Tumor Necrosis Factor- Antibody and Its Neonatal Fc Receptor Variants in Mice and Cynomolgus Monkeys", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (20100401), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1124/dmd.109.031310, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 600 - 605, XP055019071 [I] 11 * Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.109.031310
 [Y]  CARLOS VACCARO ET AL, "Engineering the Fc region of immunoglobulin G to modulate in vivo antibody levels", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20051001), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:10.1038/nbt1143, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1283 - 1288, XP055049342 [Y] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular Fig.1, p.1284, col.1, li.15-17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1143
 [Y]  LUND J ET AL, "Multiple interactions of IgG with its core oligosaccharide can modulate recognition by complement and human Fc gamma receptor I and influence the synthesis of its oligosaccharide chains", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19961201), vol. 157, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4963 - 4969, XP002484003 [Y] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular the abstract *
International search[X]EP2233500
 [Y]US2010137565
 [Y]US2008206246
 [Y]US2008292621
 [X]US2007122403