blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2767361

EP2767361 - METHOD FOR HIGH-EFFICIENCY WELDING OF THICK STEEL PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/34]METHOD FOR HIGH-EFFICIENCY WELDING OF THICK STEEL PLATE
[2016/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA, Kazuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / NOSE, Tetsuro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / INOUE, Hiroshige
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2017/01]
Former [2015/09]01 / KOJIMA, Kazuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / NOSE, Tetsuro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / INOUE, Hiroshige
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Former [2014/34]01 / KOJIMA Kazuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / NOSE Tetsuro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / INOUE Hiroshige
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/01]
Former [2014/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12849423.414.11.2012
[2017/01]
WO2012JP79492
Priority number, dateJP2011024992815.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011249928
[2014/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013073565
Date:23.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2767361
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2767361
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2015
ClassificationIPC:B23K9/18, B23K35/362, B23K35/30, C22C38/00, C22C38/14, C22C38/12, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, B23K35/36, B23K9/23, C22C38/08
[2015/39]
CPC:
B23K35/3053 (EP,CN); B23K35/3093 (EP,CN); B23K35/3602 (EP,CN);
B23K35/3607 (EP,CN); B23K35/361 (EP,CN); B23K35/362 (EP,CN);
B23K9/188 (EP,CN); B23K9/23 (EP,CN); C22C38/00 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN); C22C38/04 (EP,CN); C22C38/08 (EP,CN);
C22C38/12 (EP,CN); C22C38/14 (EP,CN) (-)
Former IPC [2014/34]B23K9/18, B23K35/362, B23K35/30, C22C38/00, C22C38/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR HOCHEFFIZIENTES SCHWEISSEN DICKER STAHLPLATTEN[2014/34]
English:METHOD FOR HIGH-EFFICIENCY WELDING OF THICK STEEL PLATES[2016/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE TRÈS EFFICACE DE PLAQUES EN ACIER ÉPAISSES[2016/49]
Former [2014/34]METHOD FOR HIGH-EFFICIENCY WELDING OF THICK STEEL PLATE
Former [2014/34]PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE TRÈS EFFICACE DE PLAQUE EN ACIER ÉPAISSE
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014Translation filed 
25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Search fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
22.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2016Fee for grant paid
25.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2016
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.11.2012
AL04.01.2017
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
TR04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/15]HU14.11.2012
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
TR04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2019/51]HU14.11.2012
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2019/46]HU14.11.2012
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU14.11.2012
AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/33]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/41]AT04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6245475  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * page 1, column left * * page 3, column left * * table 2 * * table 4 *;
 [A]JPH02258191  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]JP2011200920  (IHI CORP) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2000042741  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPS6245475  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [Y]JP2006007313  (LINCOLN GLOBAL INC);
 [Y]JPH0673757B  (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.)
by applicantJPH09206946
 JPH09277083
 JP2009241128
 JP2009195957
 JP2004143556
 JP2005193299
 JP2011200920
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.