Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2781647

EP2781647 - METHOD FOR DYEING TEXTILES USING METALLIC YARN AND POLYESTER YARN AND TEXTILE MANUFACTURED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Junglimtextile
(Geumo-dong) Happyplus 904
18 Buyong-ro 95beon-gil
Uijeongbu-si, Gyeonggi-do 480-865 / KR
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / WOO, Jung Ha
(Dongseong Apt. Ganeung-dong) 102-302
20-14 Sinchon-ro 53beon-gil
Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do 480-814 / KR
02 / KIM, Sun Jin
39-7 Sindae-gil
Amnyang-myeon
Gyeongsan-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-822 / KR
03 / CHO, Sung Hyun
(Junggok-dong) 94-4
Myeonmok-ro
Gwangjin-gu
Seoul 143-904 / KR
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12849539.730.05.2012
WO2012KR04270
Priority number, dateKR2011011819614.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110118196
[2014/39]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073753
Date:23.05.2013
Language:KO
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2781647
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:D06P3/34, D06P3/82, D06P3/52, D06P3/80
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN VON TEXTILIEN MIT EINEM METALLISCHEN GARN UND EINEM POLYESTERGARN SOWIE DADURCH HERGESTELLTE TEXTILEN[2014/39]
English:METHOD FOR DYEING TEXTILES USING METALLIC YARN AND POLYESTER YARN AND TEXTILE MANUFACTURED THEREBY[2014/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TEINTURE DE TEXTILES UTILISANT DES FILS MÉTALLIQUES ET DES FILS DE POLYESTER ET TEXTILE FABRIQUÉ DE CETTE FAÇON[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2014Translation filed 
23.01.2014National basic fee paid 
23.01.2014Search fee paid 
23.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
17.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/34]
18.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2007107152  (SOLOTEX CORP) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0019] , [0023] , [0028] , [0043] , [0046]; claim 1 *;
 [Y]GB1143955  (COURTAULDS LTD) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, line 25 - line 32 * * page 2, line 41 - line 58 *;
 [Y]CN1324181C  (WANG QIMING [CN]) [Y] 2 * claim 1 *
International search[A]JP2006257633  (FIRSTER CO LTD);
 [A]KR100588215B  (HYOSUNG CORPORATION);
 [A]JP2007191811  (SEIREN CO LTD);
 [A]KR100955517B  (IM DONG HYUN [KR])
by applicantKR100955517B
 KR100656184B