Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782290

EP2782290 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING HYBRID NETWORKING OF MULTIPLE CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION TECHNOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Junhui
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZHAO, Hongguang
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Buchet, Anne
Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date12849733.619.10.2012
WO2012CN83200
Priority number, dateCN2011136200815.11.2011         Original published format: CN201110362008
[2014/39]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013071807
Date:23.05.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782290
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/06
[2014/45]
Former International [2014/39]H04L7/00, H04L12/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER HYBRIDVERNETZUNG MEHRERER TAKTSYNCHRONISIERUNGSTECHNOLOGIEN[2014/39]
English:METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING HYBRID NETWORKING OF MULTIPLE CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION TECHNOLOGIES[2014/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE MISE EN RÉSEAU HYBRIDE DE MULTIPLES TECHNOLOGIES DE SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGES[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014Translation filed 
13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Search fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
24.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
19.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/36]
29.04.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011158120  (HAMASAKI MOTOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 3;
 [A]US2011200051  (RIVAUD DANIEL [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]  - DINH THAI BUI ET AL, "Dual and hybrid PTP modules", PRECISION CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION FOR MEASUREMENT CONTROL AND COMMUNICATION (ISPCS), 2011 INTERNATIONAL IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110912), doi:10.1109/ISPCS.2011.6070141, ISBN 978-1-61284-893-8, pages 31 - 37, XP031974492 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPCS.2011.6070141
 [A]  - MICHEL OUELLETTE ET AL, "Using IEEE 1588 and boundary clocks for clock synchronization in telecom networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20110201), vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2011.5706325, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 164 - 171, XP011334692 [A] 3 * abstract * * page 167, column l, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2011.5706325
International search[A]US2011255546  (LE PALLEC, MICHEL ET AL.);
 [A]WO2011060965  (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL));
 [A]US7483450  (NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED);
 [A]US2010172453  (ALCATEL LUCENT);
 [A]CN102098194  (ZTE CORPORATION)