Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786398

EP2786398 - MASS DISTRIBUTION SPECTROMETRY METHOD AND MASS DISTRIBUTION SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.04.2016  [2016/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KYOGAKU, Masafumi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / IWASAKI, Kota
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12849986.025.10.2012
WO2012JP78263
Priority number, dateJP2011025155217.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011251552
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073373
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786398
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/14, H01J49/00, H01J49/06, H01J49/40, G01N23/225, G01N27/62
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/41]H01J49/10, G01N27/62, H01J49/06, H01J49/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:MASSENVERTEILUNGS-SPEKTROMETRIEVERFAHREN UND MASSENVERTEILUNGSSPEKTROMETER[2014/41]
English:MASS DISTRIBUTION SPECTROMETRY METHOD AND MASS DISTRIBUTION SPECTROMETER[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE DISTRIBUTION DE MASSE ET SPECTROMÈTRE DE DISTRIBUTION DE MASSE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
04.03.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US3480774  (SMITH DAVID P) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 6, line 43 - column 8, line 47 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,9,10 [I] 5;
 [XA]EP0427532  (SCHULTZ J ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * page 6, line 33 - page 8, line 34 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 6,7,9,10;
 [XA]EP0425204  (HITACHI LTD [JP]; HITACHI INSTRUMENTS ENG [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 37 * * figure 4 * [A] 2,3,6,7,9,10;
 [XA]JP2008021504  (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * figures 2,3 * [A] 3-7,9,10
 [XA]  - SCHUELER B, "Microscope imaging by time-of-flight secondary ion mass spectroscopy", MICROSCOPY, MICROANALYSIS, MICROSTRUCTURES, LES ULIS, FR, (19920401), vol. 3, no. 2/3, doi:10.1051/MMM:0199200302-3011900, ISSN 1154-2799, pages 119 - 139, XP002559196 [X] 1-5,8 * page 121, paragraph "2. A TOF_SIMS ion microscope system: experimental - page 122 * * figure 1 * [A] 6,7,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/mmm:0199200302-3011900
 [XA]  - E NIEHUIS ET AL, "Design and performance of a reflectron based time-of-flight secondary ion mass spectrometer with electrodynamic primary ion mass separation", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY A, (19870731), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1116/1.574781, pages 1243 - 1246, XP055206425 [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * figure 1 * * paragraph ["A. Primary beam system"] * * paragraph ["B. Mass analyzer"] * [A] 3,6,7,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.574781
International search[A]JP2007157353  (OSAKA UNIVERSITY);
 [A]JP2011522366  (SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY);
 [A]JP2008021504  (FUJITSU LIMITED);
 [A]JP2002203510  (HORIBA, LTD.);
 [A]JPH0494050  (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO., LTD.)