blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2780159 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2780159



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 218
21.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
04.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.09.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
05.09.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
15.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.01.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 7
23.04.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
14.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
28.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26