blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2780159


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
03.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
05.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.01.2018 First examination report
25.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
25.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
26.09.2014 Change - inventor published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
13.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication