blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2780159
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017299093Global Dossier 19.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201213679810 16.11.2012
US201161560591 16.11.2011
US201715638089 29.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9726306Global Dossier 08.08.2017B2
US2013133775 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213679810 16.11.2012
US201161560591 16.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2854955Global Dossier 11.06.2019C
CA2854955 23.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011
WO2012CA50827 16.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2780159Global Dossier 09.01.2019B1
EP2780159 27.05.2015A4
EP2780159 24.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011
WO2012CA50827 16.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012339553B 12.05.2016B2
AU2012339553 19.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011
WO2012CA50827 16.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2780159T 08.04.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011
WO2012CA50827 16.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013071449Global Dossier 23.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR088889 16.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161560591 16.11.2011