Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2780159

EP2780159 - FLEXIBLE REINFORCED PIPE AND REINFORCEMENT TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shawcor Ltd.
3501-54th Avenue SE
Calgary, Alberta T2C 0A9 / CA
[2018/49]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Flexpipe Systems Inc.
3501 54 Avenue SE
Calgary, AB T2C 0A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / DUNCAN, Mark
214 Douglasdale Court SE
Calgary, Alberta T2Z 3B4 / CA
02 / NIU, Hao
149 Tuscany Ridge Park NW
Calgary, Alberta T3L 2H6 / CA
03 / CONLEY, Jeffrey Ryan
PO Box 1915
Milton, QLD / AU
04 / EDMONDSON, Stephen James
337 Claremont Crescent
Oakville, Ontario L6J 6J9 / CA
05 / HOLUB, Jiri
10 Avening Drive
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1Y1 / CA
06 / ANDRENACCI, Alfredo
34 Path Hill Place
Scarborough, Ontario M1V 2W5 / CA
07 / GUJARE, Nitin
80 Strathaven Drive
Unit 20
Mississauga, Ontario L5R 3V9 / CA
 [2014/44]
Former [2014/39]01 / DUNCAN, Mark
214 Douglasdale Court SE
Calgary, Alberta T2Z 3B4 / CA
02 / NIU, Hao
149 Tuscany Ridge Park NW
Calgary, Alberta T3L 2H6 / CA
03 / CONLEY, Jeffrey Ryan
102 Panamount Villas NW
Calgary, Alberta T3K 0AY / CA
04 / EDMONDSON, Stephen James
337 Claremont Crescent
Oakville, Ontario L6J 6J9 / CA
05 / HOLUB, Jiri
10 Avening Drive
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1Y1 / CA
06 / ANDRENACCI, Alfredo
34 Path Hill Place
Scarborough, Ontario M1V 2W5 / CA
07 / GUJARE, Nitin
80 Strathaven Drive
Unit 20
Mississauga, Ontario L5R 3V9 / CA
Representative(s)Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
12th Floor
Cale Cross House
156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12850058.416.11.2012
[2019/02]
WO2012CA50827
Priority number, dateUS201161560591P16.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161560591 P
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013071449
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2780159
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2780159
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:B32B1/08, B32B27/04, B32B3/18, B32B7/10, C08J5/10, F16L11/08, F16L11/20, B32B5/02, B32B5/08, B32B5/12, B32B5/26, B32B7/00, B32B27/12, B32B27/18, B32B27/34
[2015/22]
Former International [2014/39]B32B1/08, B32B27/04, B32B3/18, B32B7/10, C08J5/10, F16L11/08, F16L11/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
Extension statesBA11.06.2014
ME11.06.2014
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLES, VERSTÄRKTES ROHR UND VERSTÄRKUNGSBAND DAFÜR[2014/39]
English:FLEXIBLE REINFORCED PIPE AND REINFORCEMENT TAPE[2014/39]
French:TUYAU RENFORCÉ SOUPLE ET BANDE DE RENFORT[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2014National basic fee paid 
11.06.2014Search fee paid 
11.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2018Fee for grant paid
29.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002100516  (POWELL STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0047]; figures 1-3b * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US2006127620  (FISHER WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0023] - [0057]; figures 1-2 * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US2008210329  (QUIGLEY PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0014] - [0037]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US7600537  (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * column 2, lines 14-35 * * column 3, line 3 - column 7, line 40 * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US2004144440  (LUNDBERG CHRIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0039]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-11;
 [XI]US2010218839  (CONLEY JEFFREY [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0060]; figures 1-8 * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US2005189029  (QUIGLEY PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0032] - [0055]; figures 1-5 * [I] 5,11;
 [A]US2011260354  (RAMLI RAFIZI [US], et al) [A] 5,11 * paragraphs [0116] , [0118] , [0133] , [0160] , [0166] , [0300]; tables 4,8 *
International search[X]US7600537  (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US], et al);
 [X]CA2513506  (FLEXPIPE SYSTEMS INC [CA]);
 [X]CA2753024  (FLEXPIPE SYSTEMS INC [CA]);
 [X]JP2003207077  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC);
 [X]US6109306  (KLEINERT HELMUT [DE])
by applicantUS2002100516
 US2006127620
 US2008210329
 US7600537
 US2004144440
 US2010218839
 US2005189029
 US2011260354