Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782278

EP2782278 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEPTION DEVICE, TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND RECEPTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2016  [2016/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Hoso Kyokai
2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-8001 / JP
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / ASAKURA, Shingo
c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories
10-11 Kinuta 1-chome
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 157-8510 / JP
02 / MURAYAMA, Kenichi
c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories
10-11 Kinuta 1-chome
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 157-8510 / JP
03 / TAGUCHI, Makoto
c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories
10-11 Kinuta 1-chome
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 157-8510 / JP
04 / SHITOMI, Takuya
c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories
10-11 Kinuta 1-chome
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 157-8510 / JP
05 / SHIBUYA, Kazuhiko
c/o NHK Science&Technology Research Laboratories
10-11 Kinuta 1-chome
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 157-8510 / JP
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12850079.016.11.2012
WO2012JP07374
Priority number, dateJP2011025314618.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011253146
JP2012018357122.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012183571
[2014/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073195
Date:23.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782278
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04J99/00, H03M13/27, H04B7/04, H04J11/00, H04L1/06, H04L1/00
[2015/26]
Former International [2014/39]H04J99/00, H03M13/27, H04B7/04, H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN[2014/39]
English:TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEPTION DEVICE, TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND RECEPTION METHOD[2014/39]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2014Translation filed 
16.05.2014National basic fee paid 
16.05.2014Search fee paid 
16.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
22.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/23]
22.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008082277  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; ROH DONG WOOK [KR]; KIM BONG HOE [KR]; YUN YO) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12 * page 80 - page 81 * * page 147 - page 157; figures 10B,24A,24B,29B,33 * [Y] 6,7,10,13;
 [Y]EP2164177  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 10,13 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0110]; figure 12 *;
 [X]  - LIANG ZHOU ET AL, "High Performance Space Frequency Interleaved MIMO-OFDM Eigenmode Transmission Systems", 2006 IEEE 64TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE : VTC 2006-FALL ; 25 - 28 SEPTEMBER 2006, MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA, PISCATAWAY, NJ : IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, (20060901), doi:10.1109/VTCF.2006.106, ISBN 978-1-4244-0062-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031051129 [X] 1,3,8,11,12 * section II and figure 1. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTCF.2006.106
 [Y]  - SEOKJOON HONG ET AL, "Interleaved Spatial Diversity Transmission with Coordinate Interleaver for MIMO-OFDM Systems", VTC SPRING 2009, IEEE 69TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (20090401), doi:10.1109/VETECS.2009.5073614, pages 1 - 4, XP055150099 [Y] 6,7 * section III.B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2009.5073614
International search[Y]WO2011086953  (SONY CORP.);
 [Y]JP4594361B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011129981  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP.);
 [Y]  - SEOKJOON HONG ET AL., "Interleaved Spatial Diversity Transmission with Coordinate Interleaver for MIMO-OFDM Systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2009., (20090429), pages 1 - 4, XP055150099

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2009.5073614
 [Y]  - TAKUYA SHITOMI ET AL., "Technology for the next generation of digital terrestrial broadcasting: field experiment of dual polarized MIMO transmission using circularly and skew polarization", ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20110304), vol. 35, no. 13, pages 1 - 4, XP008174009
 [XP]  - SHINGO ASAKURA ET AL., "Technology for the next generation of digital terrestrial broadcasting : A study of decoding method of LDPC code in dual polarized MIMO transmission", ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20120608), vol. 36, no. 23, pages 25 - 30, XP008174011
 [XP]  - SHINGO ASAKURA ET AL., "Technology for the next generation of digital terrestrial broadcasting : A study of multi dimensional interleaving", ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, (201202), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 53 - 58, XP008174010
by applicantJP2008505558
    - "Transmission System for Digital Terrestrial Television Broadcasting", ARIB STD-B31, ASSOCIATION OF RADIO INDUSTRIES AND BUSINESSES
    - NAKAHARA, "A Study on soft decision decoding of 64QAM modulated OFDM signals under multi path distortion", ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, (199806), vol. 22, no. 34, pages 1 - 6
    - "Easy to understand MIMO system technology", OHGANE; OGAWA, English translation of original Japanese title, OHMSHA, page 101