Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802320

EP2802320 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THEM AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.
Hi-Tech Park
Edmond J. Safra Campus
Givat Ram
91390 Jerusalem / IL
[2019/08]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.
Hi-Tech Park
Edmond J. Safra Campus
Givat Ram
91390 Jerusalem / IL
Inventor(s)01 / BEN-SASSON, Shmuel
9 Beit-Hakerem Street
96343 Jerusalem / IL
02 / DAGAN, Arie
13 Harlap Street
92341 Jerusalem / IL
03 / PERLES, Sharon
15 Shay Agnon Street
93589 Jerusalem / IL
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP
The Gridiron Building
One Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/08]Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP
16 Upper Woburn Place
London WC1H 0BS / GB
Former [2014/47]Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG
Austrasse 24
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date12850186.315.11.2012
[2019/08]
WO2012IL50461
Priority number, dateUS201161559964P15.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161559964 P
US201261603508P27.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261603508 P
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013072915
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802320
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802320
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/14
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2014/47]
English:TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING THEM AND USES THEREOF[2014/47]
French:COMPOSÉS TRICYCLIQUES, COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2014National basic fee paid 
12.06.2014Search fee paid 
12.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2019Fee for grant paid
03.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]LT20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
Former [2019/33]LT20.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2676966  (CUSIC JOHN W, et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * page 2, column 3, line 2 - line 6 * * page 2; examples 1-3 * * claims 1-3 * [I] 8;
 [X]GB832568  (CLIN BYLA ETS) [X] 1-7 * page 3; examples 5-7 *;
 [I]FR1186832  (ETABLISSEMENTS CLIN-BYLA [FR]) [I] 1-7 * page 3; examples 5-7 *
International search[A]US2009317372  (KISS ZOLTAN [US]);
 [A]US8053436  (HALAZY SERGE [FR], et al);
 [A]US6440961  (LOHRAY BRAJ BHUSHAN [IN], et al);
 [A]US6933313  (HARPER RICHARD WALTZ [US], et al);
 [A]WO03027084  (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al)
 [X]  - KAWANISHI ET AL., "Unexpected Salt Effects on Charge Separation Yields in Phenothiazine Derivatives-Methylviologen Systems", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1986), vol. 90, pages 6034 - 6037, XP055154544

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100280a115
by applicantUS2676966
    - FARMER SR, Gene & Development, (20080000), vol. 22, pages 1269 - 1275
    - PETROVIC N, IBC, (20100000), vol. 258, pages 7153 - 7164
    - OHNO H. et al., Cell Metabolism, (20120000), vol. 15, pages 395 - 404