Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2802320


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
18.01.2019 (Expected) grant published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.01.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2017 Change - representative
02.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.07.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.07.2016 First examination report
19.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
23.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
16.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
25.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication