EP2780811 - READING FILES STORED ON A STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | [2018/38] |
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Intellectual Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLTSIDAS, Ioannis IBM Research GmbH IBM Research - Zurich Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 02 /
SARAFIJANOVIC, Slavisa IBM Research GmbH IBM Research - Zurich Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 03 /
ELEFTHERIOU, Evangelos Stavros IBM Research GmbH IBM Research - Zurich Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 04 /
JELITTO, Jens IBM Research GmbH IBM Research - Zurich Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 05 /
HAAS, Robert IBM Research GmbH IBM Research - Zurich Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 06 /
HAUSTEIN, Nils IBM Deutschland GmbH Hechtsheimer Strasse 2 55131 Mainz / DE | 07 /
SAUPP, Alexander IBM Deutschland GmbH Hechtsheimer Strasse 2 55131 Mainz / DE | 08 /
SEIPP, Harald IBM Deutschland GmbH Hechtsheimer Strasse 2 55131 Mainz / DE | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael c/o IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Postfach 71137 Ehningen / DE | [2018/19] |
Former [2014/39] | Ragot, Sébastien Pierre IBM Research GmbH Intellectual Property Law Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 12850291.1 | 26.10.2012 | [2018/19] | WO2012JP06885 | Priority number, date | EP20110189769 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11189769 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073114 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2780811 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2780811 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2780811 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F12/0862, G06F12/0866, G06F12/123 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F12/0862 (EP,US);
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (EP);
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0659 (EP);
G06F3/0682 (EP);
G06F2212/213 (EP,US);
G06F2212/224 (EP,US);
G06F2212/463 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | G06F12/00, G06F3/06, G06F12/12, G06F12/08, H04L25/02, H04L27/26 | ||
Former IPC [2014/39] | G06F12/00, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LESEN VON DATEIEN AUF EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2014/39] | English: | READING FILES STORED ON A STORAGE SYSTEM | [2014/39] | French: | LIRE DES FICHIERS MÉMORISÉS DANS UN SYSTÈME MÉMOIRE | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.08.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PL, FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 23.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | 25.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2012 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | PT | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | IE | 26.10.2018 | LU | 26.10.2018 | MT | 26.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MK | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PT | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
MT | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PT | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
MT | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PT | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
MT | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
MT | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
MT | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]GB2448353 (XENDATA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,10-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 2; figure 3 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 8,9 [I] 3,4; | [Y]EP1505506 (SAP AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2011238906 (AMIR ARNON [US], et al) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0068] - [0075] - [0 81] , [0 85] - [0087] - [ 115] , [ 123] , [ 181] , [ 185] - [0188] - [ 194]; figures 14-17; claims 1-23 * | International search | [Y]US2011238906 (AMIR ARNON [US], et al); | [Y]JP2009205719 (IBM); | [Y]US2005055511 (SCHRETER IVAN [DE]) | Examination | US2004172495 | by applicant | US2008040539 | US2010211731 | US7864479 | US5829046 | US7644204 | US6711580 | GB2448353 | EP1505506 | US2011238906 | US2004172495 | - L. DUBOIS, Driving to best practices in archiving, (20070300), page 6 | - "The case for massive arrays of idle disks", D. COLARELLI; D. GRUNWALD; M. NEUFELD, Dept. of Computer Science, Univ. of Colorado, (20020107), page 3 | - D. CUDDIHY, Optimizing virtual tape performance: improving efficiency with disk storage system, Atto Technology Incorporation, Embedded Software Group, (20070600), page 6 |