blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2782402 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2782402



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 468
21.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.08.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
09.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 79
09.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 79
20.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
20.04.2017 Description Search / examination 2
20.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
03.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.02.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.10.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
19.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.06.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
26.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
03.06.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
12.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
12.05.2014 Description Search / examination 50
12.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 26
12.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
14.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
23.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 69