blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2782402


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019 [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019 [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
07.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
04.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.2018 Change - classification published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
27.07.2018 Change - classification published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.02.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.10.2016 First examination report
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
29.05.2015 Change - classification published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Change - classification published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
23.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication