blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2782402 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280056827 EP12850383



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10045298Global Dossier 07.08.2018B2
US2017273023 21.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201715617124 08.06.2017
US201414356068 02.05.2014
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9699734Global Dossier 04.07.2017B2
US2014321349 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
US201214356068 19.11.2012
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101891009BGlobal Dossier 22.08.2018B1
KR20160069520 16.06.2016A
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101624890BGlobal Dossier 27.05.2016B1
KR20140094521 30.07.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5903167BGlobal Dossier 13.04.2016B2
JP2015505428 19.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103947263BGlobal Dossier 02.03.2018B
CN103947263 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2856040Global Dossier 02.01.2018C
CA2856040 23.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2782402Global Dossier 09.01.2019B1
EP2782402 01.07.2015A4
EP2782402 24.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012337487B 03.09.2015B2
AU2012337487 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2590906 10.07.2016C2
RU2014124357 27.12.2015A
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
WO2012KR09796 19.11.2012
US201161561246 17.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013073920Global Dossier 23.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161561927 20.11.2011
US201161561246 17.11.2011