Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782402

EP2782402 - METHODS OF TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING FRAME BY STATION OPERATING IN POWER SAVE MODE IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SEOK, Yong Ho
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
02 / YOU, Hyang Sun
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
03 / PARK, Jong Hyun
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2014/39]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12850383.619.11.2012
[2019/02]
WO2012KR09796
Priority number, dateUS201161561246P17.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161561246 P
US201161561927P20.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161561927 P
[2014/39]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073920
Date:23.05.2013
Language:KO
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782402
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782402
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W74/08, H04L1/18, // H04L12/825, H04W76/28, H04W84/12
[2018/35]
Former International [2015/27]H04W52/02, H04W74/08, H04L1/18, // H04L12/825, H04W76/04, H04W84/12
Former International [2014/39]H04W52/02, H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON FRAMES VON EINER STATION IM ENERGIESPARMODUS IN EINEM WLAN-SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG[2014/39]
English:METHODS OF TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING FRAME BY STATION OPERATING IN POWER SAVE MODE IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING SAME[2014/39]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE TRAME PAR UNE STATION FONCTIONNANT EN MODE D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DANS UN SYSTÈME LAN SANS FIL ET APPAREIL LES PRENANT EN CHARGE[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014Translation filed 
12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Search fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
13.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008225768  (WENTINK MAARTEN MENZO [NL]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * figures 3, 6, 8, 17, 19, 22 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0080] * [I] 3,4,7;
 [XI]US2005152324  (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * figures 4, 5A, 5B * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * claims 1-3 * [I] 3,7;
 [A]US2004013128  (MORETON MICHAEL JOHN VIDION [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081] *
International search[A]US2011199952  (SEOK YONG HO [KR]);
 [A]KR20110016374  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20100013505  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20090115479  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20080045015  (KT CORP [KR], et al);
 [A]US2007201467  (KAKANI NAVEEN K [US])
ExaminationUS2009196212