Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782418

EP2782418 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT AND PLANAR LIGHT-EMITTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / OKUYAMA, Masato
c/o Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
02 / TONISHI, Masakazu
c/o Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12850585.603.10.2012
WO2012JP75691
Priority number, dateJP2011024893214.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011248932
[2014/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073302
Date:23.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782418
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/04, H01L51/50, H01L51/52, // H01L27/32
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/39]H05B33/04, H01L51/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT UND PLANARE LICHTEMITTIERENDE EINHEIT[2014/39]
English:ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT AND PLANAR LIGHT-EMITTING UNIT[2014/39]
French:ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET UNITÉ ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE PLANE[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014Translation filed 
25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Search fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
15.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2005353501  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY; MASUDA TAKESHI; MITANI TADAOKI; KOMATSU S) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0029] , [0031] , [0032] , [0033]; figure 3 * [Y] 4,10;
 [XY]US2004079941  (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraphs [0179] , [0181] , [0185] , [0190] , [0191] , [0192]; figure 2b * [Y] 3,4,10;
 [XY]KR20090128301  (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0023] , [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0063]; figures 1-5,9 * [Y] 3,4,10;
 [Y]US2004061437  (IKAGAWA MASAKUNI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0038] , [0041] , [0053] , [0054] , [0055] , [0093]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]JPH11283752  (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2009115955  (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE]; KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL) [Y] 10 * pages 1-3; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2006108913  (COK RONALD S [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0031]; figure 1 *
International search[Y]JP2005353501  (JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY);
 [Y]JP2002040964  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2007311219  (TOKKI CORP.);
 [Y]JP2004111158  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2005100815
 JP2007059094
 JP2004068143
 JP2000160328
 US5061569
 JPH04308688
 JPH11251067
 JPH04297076
 JP2000196140
 JP2001102175
 JP2001257076
 JP2002308855
 JP2001313179
 JP2002319491
 JP2001357977
 JP2002334786
 JP2002008860
 JP2002334787
 JP2002015871
 JP2002334788
 JP2002043056
 JP2002334789
 JP2002075645
 JP2002338579
 JP2002105445
 JP2002343568
 JP2002141173
 JP2002352957
 JP2002203683
 JP2002363227
 JP2002231453
 JP2003003165
 JP2002234888
 JP2003027048
 JP2002255934
 JP2002260861
 JP2002280183
 JP2002299060
 JP2002302516
 JP2002305083
 JP2002305084
 JP2002308837
 JPH10270172
    - "Electrode Material", Organic EL Element and Industrial Forefront Thereof, NTS INC., (19981130), pages 123 - 166
    - J. HUANG, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2002), vol. 80, page 139
    - J. APPL. PHYS., (2004), vol. 95, page 5773
    - "Course of Experimental Chemistry", Spectroscopy II, MARUZEN, (1992), vol. 7, page 398
    - New Edition Handbook of Color Science, UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO PRESS, (1985), page 108