Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2781831

EP2781831 - LED LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.08.2017  [2017/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Icepipe Corporation
(Gasan-dongByucksan Digital Valley 6-cha)
Suite 13 219 Gasan Digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu, Seoul 153-803 / KR
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sang Cheol
(Burim-dong)
29-5 Burim-4 gil
Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-803 / KR
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12850634.207.11.2012
WO2012KR09309
Priority number, dateKR2011011836414.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110118364
KR2012000203406.01.2012         Original published format: KR 20120002034
[2014/39]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013073792
Date:23.05.2013
Language:KO
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2781831
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F21V29/00, F21V17/00, F21K99/00, // F21Y111/00
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/39]F21V29/00, F21V17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:LED-BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/39]
English:LED LIGHTING DEVICE[2014/39]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase16.04.2014Translation filed 
16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Search fee paid 
16.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
16.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
12.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/35]
06.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011089830  (PICKARD PAUL KENNETH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,13-15 * figures 4-6, 23-25 * * paragraphs [0292] - [0327] * * paragraphs [0355] , [ 356] * [Y] 5,10,12;
 [X]US2010314985  (PREMYSLER PHILIP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,13-15 * figures 2, 14 * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] *;
 [XI]WO2011112005  (SOLARKOR COMPANY LTD [KR]; KIM HYUNMIN [KR]) [X] 1,2,11,13-15 * figure 5 * [I] 12;
 [X]CN201496804U  (TONG HUANG) [X] 1,2,4,11,13-15 * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]JP2004296245  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,11-15 * figures 1, 2, 4 *;
 [Y]US2010207502  (CAO DENSEN [US] ET AL) [Y] 5 * figure 5 *;
 [Y]KR20110089737  (ZAONZI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 10 * figures 1, 3 *;
 [Y]WO2011105030  (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]; TOSHIBA KK [JP]; BETSUDA NOBUHIKO) [Y] 12 * figure 5 *;
 [A]US2011193463  (DANIEL MUESSLI [CH] MUESSLI DANIEL [CH]) [A] 6 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0030] *
International search[X]JP2010199049  (TAIWAN GREEN POINT ENTERPRISES CO., LTD.);
 [Y]KR20110087012  (OH, MYEONG HO);
 [Y]KR20110089737  (ZAONZI CO.,LTD.);
 [Y]KR101039073B  (AMOLUXE CO., LTD.)
by applicantKR20090095903