Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782521

EP2782521 - EMBOLIC DEVICE WITH SHAPED WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microvention, Inc.
1311 Valencia Avenue
Tustin, CA / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / BOWMAN, Heath
16 Tomahawk Street
Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)KIPA AB
P O Box 1065
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12850816.521.11.2012
[2017/10]
WO2012US66429
Priority number, dateUS201161563400P23.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563400 P
US201261669645P09.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261669645 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078438
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782521
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782521
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/12
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/40]A61F2/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EMBOLISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM PROFILDRAHT[2014/40]
English:EMBOLIC DEVICE WITH SHAPED WIRE[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF EMBOLIQUE AYANT UN FIL MIS EN FORME[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2014National basic fee paid 
10.06.2014Search fee paid 
10.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
24.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2017Fee for grant paid
24.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AT08.03.2017
CY08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
MT21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU21.11.2012
AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
MT21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
MT21.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE21.11.2017
LU21.11.2017
MT21.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
LU21.11.2017
MT21.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
LU21.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/14]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011094519  (GOPAL VIDYA [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0052]; figure 2a * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0055] * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5-9;
 [Y]WO2011053555  (MICROVENTION INC; KEELEY MIKE [US]; CRUISE GREGORY [US]; CONSTANT MICH) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0089] *;
 [A]US6156046  (PASSAFARO JAMES D [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * figures 4a,3 *;
 [YA]WO0213707  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 5,6 * [A] 5-9
International search[X]US2004098028  (MARTINEZ);
 [Y]US2006200190  (LORENZO ET AL.);
 [Y]US7833175  (PARINS);
 [Y]US2009156999  (ADAMS ET AL.);
 [Y]US2005055048  (DIECK ET AL.);
 [A]US2010010533  (BURKE ET AL.)