Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2783643 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2783643



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2502
04.02.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.09.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.09.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 201
03.09.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 201
20.08.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
20.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 22
20.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 22
20.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 201
12.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 201
22.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 24
29.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 25
29.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
29.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
29.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 12
29.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
03.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
19.02.2015 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
20.11.2014 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
01.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 21
19.06.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 138
19.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 130
19.06.2014 Description Search / examination 215
19.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
12.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
12.06.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
30.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 339
20.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 186
20.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 184
30.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
30.05.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 5
30.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 37
30.05.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 230