Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2783643


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
11.01.2019 Change - classification published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
21.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
18.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.08.2018 Change - representative
30.06.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.06.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.06.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.06.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.06.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.06.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.02.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.12.2017 Change - classification published on  31.01.2018  [2018/05]
29.12.2017 Change - classification published on  31.01.2018  [2018/05]
15.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
16.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
18.03.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.02.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.02.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
19.02.2015 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
11.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication