Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783643

EP2783643 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Livsmed Inc.
304, 304-1 D-dong
230, Yatamnam-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 463-760 / KR
[2019/04]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Livsmed Inc.
304, 304-1 D-dong
230, Yatamnam-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 463-760 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jung Joo
(Gongneung-dong) 102-1202 Sindo 1-cha Apt.
59 Dongil-ro 191ga-gil
Nowon-gu
Seoul 139-801 / KR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Marks & Clerk (Luxembourg) LLP
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
[2019/04]
Former [2014/40]Groth & Co. KB
P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12850884.308.11.2012
[2019/04]
WO2012KR09364
Priority number, dateKR2011012307123.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110123071
KR2011012307423.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110123074
KR2011012307523.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110123075
[2014/40]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077571
Date:30.05.2013
Language:KO
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783643
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783643
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/29, A61B17/34, A61B34/00
[2018/05]
Former International [2015/29]A61B17/29, A61B17/34, A61B17/94, A61B19/00
Former International [2014/40]A61B17/29, A61B17/34, A61B17/94
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT[2014/40]
English:SURGICAL INSTRUMENT[2014/40]
French:INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014Translation filed 
23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
19.02.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
29.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.06.2018Fee for grant paid
20.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14173058.0  / EP2807989
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2018
Opposition(s)24.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01]
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
24.02.2015Request for further processing filed
24.02.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.03.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.01.2019
AT23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SI23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2020/13]
Former [2020/03]AL23.01.2019
AT23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/52]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011106145  (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]) [X] 1-30,35-38,45-50 * abstract *;
 [X]US2007208375  (NISHIZAWA KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-30,35-38,45-50 * abstract *;
 [XP]WO2012074564  (FREEHAND ENDOSCOPIC DEVICES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-30,35-38,45-50 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] , [0081] , [0089] *;
 [X]KR101064825B  (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]) [X] 1-30,35-38,45-50 * figures 1-2,4-8 *;
 EP2641547  [ ] (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]) [ ] * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08173442  (SONY CORP, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008065116  (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [E]WO2013082220  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [E] 1-30,35-38,45-50 * abstract *
International search[A]KR20110014534  (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]);
 [A]KR20110028613  (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]);
 [A]US2007208375  (NISHIZAWA KOUJI [JP], et al);
 [A]KR20100099818  (ADEN LTD [KR]);
 [A]JP2011200666  (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC);
 [A]JP2008521485  (NOVARE SURGICAL SYSTEMS, INC);
 [A]KR20090119366  (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]);
 [A]KR20110005671  (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR])