Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783535

EP2783535 - SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INTELLIGENT NETWORK ACCESS SELECTION FOR A MOBILE WIRELESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bandwidthx Inc.
5962 La Place
Suite 185
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
[2015/44]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Visuri, Pertti
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
For all designated states
Salo, Randy
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
For all designated states
Van Hamersvled, Christian
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
For all designated states
Bandwidthx Inc.
5962 La Place
Suite 185
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VISURI, Pertti
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
02 / SALO, Randy
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
03 / VAN HAMERSVELD, Christian
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
 [2016/37]
Former [2014/40]01 / VISURI, Pertti
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
02 / SALO, Randy
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
03 / VAN HAMERSVELD, Christiand
5962 La Place Court
Suite 185
Carlsabd, CA 92008 / US
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12851159.921.11.2012
[2016/37]
WO2012US66389
Priority number, dateUS201161563735P25.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563735 P
US201261618318P30.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261618318 P
US201261671583P13.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261671583 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078408
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783535
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783535
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/54, H04W36/08, H04W36/36, // H04W36/32, H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04W48/16
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/40]H04W48/20, H04W48/08, H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER INTELLIGENTEN NETZWERKZUGANGSAUSWAHL FÜR EINE MOBILE DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG[2014/40]
English:SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INTELLIGENT NETWORK ACCESS SELECTION FOR A MOBILE WIRELESS DEVICE[2014/40]
French:SYSTÈME EN VUE D'OBTENIR UNE SÉLECTION INTELLIGENTE D'ACCÈS DE RÉSEAU POUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE SANS FIL[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Search fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2016Fee for grant paid
02.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16187937.4  / EP3131238
EP18151712.9  / EP3358792
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2016
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE21.11.2016
MT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU21.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE21.11.2016
MT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU21.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE21.11.2016
MT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU21.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011286437  (AUSTIN MARK DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0036] , [0039] , [0043] - [0056]; figure 1b *;
 [A]EP1926283  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0048] - [0052] - [0056] - [0064] - [0067] - [0077] *;
 [A]US2010177673  (YOON JUNG IL [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] - [0023] - [0027] , [0033] , [0040] - [0049] *;
 [A]WO2006126062  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 12, line 21 - page 27, line 17 *
International search[Y]US2009098869  (TORRANCE JEFFERY [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2011286437  (AUSTIN MARK DAVID [US], et al);
 [A]EP2170003  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])