Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785076

EP2785076 - AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE, AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO Kenji
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Königstrasse 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12851206.814.11.2012
WO2012JP79464
Priority number, dateJP2011025614224.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011256142
[2014/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077226
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785076
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04S3/00, // H04S7/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/40]H04S5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:TONSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, TONSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2014/40]
English:AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE, AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014Translation filed 
15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Search fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
03.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
11.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005281408  (KIM SUN-MIN [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0024] - [0039]; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]US2007092085  (KATAYAMA MASAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - HONGMEI HU ET AL, "The Estimation of Personalized HRTFs in Individual VAS", NATURAL COMPUTATION, 2008. ICNC '08. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081018), ISBN 978-0-7695-3304-9, pages 203 - 207, XP031398368 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - IIDA ET AL, "Median plane localization using a parametric model of the head-related transfer function based on spectral cues", APPLIED ACOUSTICS, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, GB, (20070505), vol. 68, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.APACOUST.2006.07.016, ISSN 0003-682X, pages 835 - 850, XP022061128 [A] 1-12 * pages 837-839 * * page 849 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apacoust.2006.07.016
International search[A]JP2011160179  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2011151633  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2010258497  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2009260574  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS JAPAN, INC.)
by applicantJP2008211834
    - IIDA ET AL., Spatial Acoustics, CORONA PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (201007), pages 19 - 21