Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782465

EP2782465 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING STABILITY FOR HEELED SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2018  [2018/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
White, Sheryl
473 Ocean View Avenue
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12851781.020.11.2012
WO2012US66062
Priority number, dateUS201161563286P23.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563286 P
US20121368112119.11.2012         Original published format: US201213681121
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078203
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782465
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A43B3/24
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STABILITÄT FÜR SCHUHE MIT ABSATZ[2014/40]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING STABILITY FOR HEELED SHOES[2014/40]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE CONFÉRER DE LA STABILITÉ À DES CHAUSSURES À TALONS[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2014National basic fee paid 
20.06.2014Search fee paid 
20.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
17.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/26]
14.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2479006  (GARTH PAULINE E) [X] 1-3,7,9,13-15 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 23; figure -; claim . *;
 [X]US2010083540  (ALLEN MASON KERMIT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0032]; figure - *;
 [XY]GB2461066  (MACFARLANE THERESA ANNE [GB]) [X] 1,5-7,9,11 * page 3, lines 1-21; figure - * [Y] 8,12;
 [YA]US2009165337  (COHEN MATTHEW [US] ET AL) [Y] 8,12 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-5; claim 7 * [A] 2,3,6,11,14,15;
 [X]US2571437  (GAETZ KENNETH M) [X] 1,3,7,9 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 19; figure - *
International search[X]DE19915297  (HOFFMANN);
 [Y]US2506245  (STANTON);
 [Y]US2008282577  (HOLEYFIELD);
 [Y]US2009217553  (JAGGER);
 [A]CN201726944U  (ZHANG ET AL.);
 [A]US2009165337  (COHEN ET AL.);
 [A]GB2428177  (LASOTA)
by applicantUS2479006
 US2010083540
 GB2461066
 US2571437