Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785139

EP2785139 - WIRELESS STATION AND METHOD OF PROCESSING USER DATA WITH WIRELESS STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
03.05.2019Change - inventorpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / AMINAKA, Hiroaki
7-1, Shiba 5-chome,
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
02 / HAMABE, Kojiro
7-1, Shiba 5-chome,
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
 [2019/23]
Former [2014/40]01 / AMINAKA, Hiroaki
7-1, Shiba 5-chome,
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
02 / HAMARE, Kojiro
7-1, Shiba 5-chome,
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12851877.603.10.2012
[2019/23]
WO2012JP06366
Priority number, dateJP2011025747725.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011257477
[2014/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076900
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785139
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785139
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W88/08, H04W72/12
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE STATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DATEN MIT DER DRAHTLOSEN STATION[2014/40]
English:WIRELESS STATION AND METHOD OF PROCESSING USER DATA WITH WIRELESS STATION[2014/40]
French:STATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR AVEC UNE STATION SANS FIL[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2014Translation filed 
05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Search fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2019Fee for grant paid
25.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011127855  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 3A,3B,4 * [I] 2-15;
 EP2525623  [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0148]; figures 3A,3B,4 *
International search[A]JP2011114689  (FUJITSU LTD.);
 [A]JP2011211325  (FUJITSU LTD.);
 [A]JP2011066593  (FUJITSU LTD.);
 [A]JP2008099306  (FUJITSU LTD.)
by applicantWO2004095861