Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784693

EP2784693 - TRANSLATION DEVICE, TRANSLATION SYSTEM, TRANSLATION METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2015/32]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd.
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ITAMOTO, Shinichi
c/o NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd.
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12852076.412.10.2012
WO2012JP76479
Priority number, dateJP2011025485122.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011254851
[2014/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077110
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784693
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, G06F17/28, G06F3/01
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/40]G06F17/28, G06F3/16, G06F17/27
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:ÜBERSETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ÜBERSETZUNGSSYSTEM, ÜBERSETZUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/40]
English:TRANSLATION DEVICE, TRANSLATION SYSTEM, TRANSLATION METHOD AND PROGRAM[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRADUCTION, SYSTÈME DE TRADUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE TRADUCTION ET PROGRAMME[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2014Translation filed 
05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Search fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
13.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/27]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005237699  (CARROLL DAVID [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,12,13 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1a,2a,2b,3 * [I] 3,10,11;
 [XI]WO2011036769  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,10,11;
 [XPI]US2012221323  (SUMITA KAZUO [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,6-9,12,13 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0105] * * figures 1-3,18 * [I] 3,5,10,11;
 [A]EP0600605  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 10 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 33 * * figures 1a,1b *;
 [AD]JPH05260193  (NEC CORP) [AD] 11 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH09160881  (SHARP KK);
 [Y]JP2005222136  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JP2010186339  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH0877176  (HITACHI LTD)
by applicantJPH05260193