Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783467

EP2783467 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGITANI, Toshiyuki
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12852187.922.11.2012
[2019/32]
WO2012JP81010
Priority number, dateJP2011025646224.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011256462
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077471
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783467
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783467
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/16, H04L29/00, H04M1/725, H04W52/02, H04W84/10
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2014/40]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS[2014/40]
French:APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
19.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2019Fee for grant paid
27.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2415334  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 14, line 8 - page 30, line 23 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-12;
 [I]US6804542  (HAARTSEN JACOBUS CORNELIS [NL]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - column 9, line 30 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [I]EP0490441  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 8, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2005157671  (SUGITANI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0122] * * figures 1-12 *;
 [I]EP1696686  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0213] * * figures 1-16 *
International search[A]JPH07147549  (TOKYO GAS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007202134  (PANASONIC CORPORATION);
 [A]JP2003060551  (NTT DOCOMO, INC.)
by applicantGB2415334
 US6804542
 EP0490441
 US2005157671
 EP1696686