Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784183


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
22.02.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
16.03.2018 (Expected) grant published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
13.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.11.2017 Change - inventor
12.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.11.2017 Change - inventor
13.10.2017 Change - classification published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - classification published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
02.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.06.2016 Change - representative
04.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
01.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
03.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication